TX SB1746 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to an interim study of recreational boating safety in Texas.
Title
Relating to an interim study of recreational boating safety in Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Administration | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3108 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09