TX SB1842 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to a Medicaid managed care pilot program to prevent high-risk pregnancies that result in the birth of premature or low birth weight infants.
Title
Relating to a Medicaid managed care pilot program to prevent high-risk pregnancies that result in the birth of premature or low birth weight infants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3363 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
BEXAR COUNTY
FAMILY PLANNING & BIRTH CONTROL
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
FAMILY PLANNING & BIRTH CONTROL
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH