TX SB1921 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . September 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . September 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Medicaid reimbursement for the provision of certain behavioral health and physical health services.
Title
Relating to Medicaid reimbursement for the provision of certain behavioral health and physical health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1519 (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1519 (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . September 1, 2022 | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1519 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-25 | House | Amended 1-Guillen |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Mental Health & Substance Abuse