TX SB1941 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to use of electric energy storage facilities in the ERCOT power region.
Title
Relating to use of electric energy storage facilities in the ERCOT power region.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--General
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--General