TX SB196 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reapportionment of congressional districts and the creation, function, and duties of the Texas Congressional Redistricting Commission.
Title
Relating to the reapportionment of congressional districts and the creation, function, and duties of the Texas Congressional Redistricting Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Redistricting, Select | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-09 | Filed | |
2010-11-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Congress
CONGRESSIONAL REDISTRICTING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Legislature
Redistricting
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
CONGRESSIONAL REDISTRICTING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Legislature
Redistricting
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed