TX SB1968 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Family Educational Relief Program and an insurance premium tax credit for contributions made for purposes of that program.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Family Educational Relief Program and an insurance premium tax credit for contributions made for purposes of that program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4537 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Family
Family--Parent & Child
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Family
Family--Parent & Child
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control