TX SB2 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of districts for the election of members of the Texas Senate.
Title
Relating to the composition of districts for the election of members of the Texas Senate.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-06-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-06-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-06-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-23 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-06-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-21 | House | Passed |
2013-06-21 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-06-21 | House | Postponed |
2013-06-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-06-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-06-20 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-06-20 | House | Postponed |
2013-06-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-06-20 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2013-06-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-06-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-06-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-06-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-06-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to Redistricting, Select |
2013-06-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-06-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Passed |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Statement(s) submitted |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Amended |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Redistricting, Select |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Filed |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |