TX SB201 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 1/1/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 1/1/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the calculation of ad valorem taxes on the residence homestead of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran for the tax year in which the veteran qualifies or ceases to qualify for an exemption from taxation of the homestead.
Title
Relating to the calculation of ad valorem taxes on the residence homestead of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran for the tax year in which the veteran qualifies or ceases to qualify for an exemption from taxation of the homestead.
Sponsors
Rep. William Callegari [R] | Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Sen. Chris Harris [R] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 1/1/12 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-24 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-21 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-21 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-21 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-21 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-21 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-09 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-09 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-09 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-09 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-09 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-09 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-09 | Read | |
2011-05-09 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-06 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-05 | Amended | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-04 | Amended | |
2011-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-04 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-04-14 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-07 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-10 | Filed | |
2010-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions