TX SB2104 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain advocacy and legal services for Texas Veterans and to tuition and fees for certain military spouses and dependents.
Title
Relating to certain advocacy and legal services for Texas Veterans and to tuition and fees for certain military spouses and dependents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1675 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1675 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | See remarks for effective date | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1675 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 2-Harless |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Miller |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3412 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Interim Studies
Legislature
Military & Veterans
TEXAS VETERANS COUNTY SERVICE OFFICER TASK FORCE
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
County Government--General
Interim Studies
Legislature
Military & Veterans
TEXAS VETERANS COUNTY SERVICE OFFICER TASK FORCE
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS