TX SB2248 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the development and operation of an aerial cable car or aerial tramway by a regional mobility authority created by a municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the development and operation of an aerial cable car or aerial tramway by a regional mobility authority created by a municipality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-16HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-05-16HouseRead first time
2019-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4475 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback