TX SB2270 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to consideration of mitigating factors in determining appropriate disciplinary action to be taken against a public school student.
Title
Relating to consideration of mitigating factors in determining appropriate disciplinary action to be taken against a public school student.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-28 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-28 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Education | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB171 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately