TX SB2445 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the New Park Municipal Management District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments and fees.
Title
Relating to the creation of the New Park Municipal Management District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments and fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1608 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 West |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
NEW PARK MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous