TX SB2497 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the creation of the North Texas Groundwater Conservation District; providing authority to issue bonds.
Title
Relating to the creation of the North Texas Groundwater Conservation District; providing authority to issue bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Effective immediately | |
2009-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-20 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-19 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Passed | |
2009-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-04-06 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4809 (Same As) 2009-05-24 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Subjects
NORTH TEXAS GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility