TX SB2505 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers, duties, and governance of the Westwood Magnolia Parkway Improvement District; providing authority to impose taxes and issue bonds.
Title
Relating to the powers, duties, and governance of the Westwood Magnolia Parkway Improvement District; providing authority to impose taxes and issue bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1608 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-M. González |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-17 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4714 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
WESTWOOD MAGNOLIA PARKWAY IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
WESTWOOD MAGNOLIA PARKWAY IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT