TX SB2515 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the administration, powers and duties, operations, and financing of The Woodlands Township; providing authority to impose an events admission tax.
Title
Relating to the administration, powers and duties, operations, and financing of The Woodlands Township; providing authority to impose an events admission tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-22 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-11 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-11 | Read first time | |
2009-05-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Amended | |
2009-05-07 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-07 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-08 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-04-08 | Read first time | |
2009-04-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4782 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call