TX SB327 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a court to return certain fees to a person who is the subject of an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a court to return certain fees to a person who is the subject of an order of nondisclosure of criminal history record information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-17HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-04-17HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-12-14SenateFiled
2016-12-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback