TX SB334 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of an emergency services district to provide preventive health care services.
Title
Relating to the authority of an emergency services district to provide preventive health care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4922 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Referred to Local Government
HB4922 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Referred to Local Government
HB4922 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous