TX SB340 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for child and adult diapers.
Title
Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for child and adult diapers.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Filed |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB340 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00340I.htm |