TX SB439 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application of certain insurance regulations to certain small employer health reimbursement arrangements.
Title
Relating to the application of certain insurance regulations to certain small employer health reimbursement arrangements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected comm. report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-30 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |