TX SB502 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the content of detailed reports filed by lobbyists and to monetary limits on expenditures by lobbyists.
Title
Relating to the content of detailed reports filed by lobbyists and to monetary limits on expenditures by lobbyists.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2017-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |