TX SB525 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to certain qualified alien physicians practicing medicine in this state.
Title
Relating to certain qualified alien physicians practicing medicine in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-12 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-03-19 | Record vote | |
2009-03-19 | Passed | |
2009-03-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-19 | Record vote | |
2009-03-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-03-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-03-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-03-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-03 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-02 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-02-24 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-02-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-01-23 | Filed | |
2009-01-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aliens
Health Care Providers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
RESIDENCY REQUIREMENTS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health Care Providers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIANS
RESIDENCY REQUIREMENTS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF