TX SB542 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the delegation of certain authority of a county judge or commissioners court in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the delegation of certain authority of a county judge or commissioners court in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Judges
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--Judges