TX SB562 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to criminal or juvenile procedures regarding persons who are or may be persons with a mental illness or intellectual disability and the operation and effects of successful completion of a mental health court program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to criminal or juvenile procedures regarding persons who are or may be persons with a mental illness or intellectual disability and the operation and effects of successful completion of a mental health court program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1973 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1664 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - RV#1594 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1973
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-24SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-23SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1664
2019-05-22HousePassed as amended
2019-05-22HouseAmended 2-White
2019-05-22HouseAmended 1-Moody
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1594
2019-05-21HouseAmended 1-Moody
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenatePassed
2019-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-29SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-02-21SenateRead first time
2019-01-31SenateFiled
2019-01-31SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB562
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00562I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00562S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00562E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00562H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00562F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=23
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB562&RcdVtNo=1594&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB562&RcdVtNo=1664&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB562&RcdVtNo=1973&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=85

Bill Comments

feedback