TX SB576 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.
Title
Relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of small claims courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |