TX SB601 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of Elite Rodeo Association World Championships for funding from the Major Events trust fund.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of Elite Rodeo Association World Championships for funding from the Major Events trust fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] |
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
County Government
County Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--General
County Government
County Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--General