TX SB617 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of certain home address information in ad valorem tax appraisal records.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of certain home address information in ad valorem tax appraisal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Effective immediately | |
2023-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1176 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Border Security |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB96 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Referred to Border Security
HB96 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Referred to Border Security
HB96 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Referred to Border Security
Subjects
BORDER PATROL AGENTS
Law Enforcement
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Law Enforcement
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous