TX SB667 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study on the feasibility of requiring certain researchers to make research papers available to the public.
Title
Relating to a study on the feasibility of requiring certain researchers to make research papers available to the public.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Open Government |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Electronic Information Systems
Libraries & Librarians
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Electronic Information Systems
Libraries & Librarians
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS