TX SB707 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the admissibility of certain recorded statements made by child abuse victims.
Title
Relating to the admissibility of certain recorded statements made by child abuse victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Trial
EVIDENCE
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Trial
EVIDENCE
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety