TX SB733 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to change the date of their general elections.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to change the date of their general elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - SB 733Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - SB 733Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Meyer (Y: 33 N: 92 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - SB 733Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Meyer (Y: 33 N: 92 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-20 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-20 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-14 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-12 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Motion to table fails |
2015-05-11 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2015-05-11 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Elections |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |