TX SB827 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures for asserting claims under the Americans with Disabilities Act; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to procedures for asserting claims under the Americans with Disabilities Act; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Disabilities, Persons with
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Disabilities, Persons with
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB827 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00827I.htm |