TX SB847 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain hospital districts to contract for the performance of administrative functions and services.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain hospital districts to contract for the performance of administrative functions and services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Davis [R] | Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-28 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-14 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Filed | |
2011-02-22 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital