TX SB870 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the duties of the interagency obesity council and the Department of Agriculture relating to health, wellness, and prevention of obesity and to the establishment of an obesity prevention pilot program.
Title
Relating to the duties of the interagency obesity council and the Department of Agriculture relating to health, wellness, and prevention of obesity and to the establishment of an obesity prevention pilot program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Record vote | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-30 | Read | |
2009-05-30 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-05-23 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-13 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-06 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-02-16 | Filed | |
2009-02-16 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3327 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
INTERAGENCY OBESITY COUNCIL
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
INTERAGENCY OBESITY COUNCIL
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF