TX SB885 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the grounds for terminating and reinstating a person's parental rights and the adoption of certain children.
Title
Relating to the grounds for terminating and reinstating a person's parental rights and the adoption of certain children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2023-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |