TX SB913 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to energy and water management planning and reporting requirements for state agencies and institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to energy and water management planning and reporting requirements for state agencies and institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Energy
Energy--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
Water--General
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Energy
Energy--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
Water--General