TX SB943 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to a pilot project to establish a comprehensive single point of entry for long-term services and supports provided to the aged and physically disabled individuals.
Title
Relating to a pilot project to establish a comprehensive single point of entry for long-term services and supports provided to the aged and physically disabled individuals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-02-18 | Filed | |
2009-02-18 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1398 (Same As) 2009-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Aging
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance