TX SB988 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the assessment of litigation costs and attorney's fees in certain actions under the public information law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the assessment of litigation costs and attorney's fees in certain actions under the public information law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1565 (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1565
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-04-08HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-08HouseRead first time
2019-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenatePassed
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-22SenateFiled
2019-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2192 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Considered in Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback