TX SCR21 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Veteran Affairs & Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Texas as a Purple Heart State.
Title
Recognizing Texas as a Purple Heart State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SCR21 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SC00021I.htm |