TX SCR56 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of representatives to create a joint interim committee to examine all state open-government laws.
Title
Requesting the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of representatives to create a joint interim committee to examine all state open-government laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - House - Adopted RV#2033 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |