TX SCR65 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Designating May 12, 2009, as Mary Kay Ash Day in the State of Texas.
Title
Designating May 12, 2009, as Mary Kay Ash Day in the State of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-25 | Adopted | |
2009-05-25 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-25 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-28 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-28 | Read & adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
MARY KAY ASH DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates