US HB1004 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta National Heritage Area Establishment Act - Establishes the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta National Heritage Area in California. Designates the Delta Protection Commission as the management entity for the Heritage Area. Requires the Commission to submit a proposed management plan for the Heritage Area to the Secretary of the Interior for approval. Bars approval of the management plan until the Secretary has received certification from the Commission that the Delta Stewardship Council has reviewed such plan for consistency with the plan adopted by the Council pursuant to state law.
Title
Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta National Heritage Area Establishment Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. George Miller [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB228 (Same As) 2013-04-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-27.
HB2200 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB1237 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB2200 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB1237 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1004/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1004/BILLS-113hr1004ih.pdf |