US HB1012 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Savings Start With Us Act of 2011 - Reduces the annual rate of pay in 2013 for Members of Congress and the Vice President by 10% of the 2011 pay rate. Maintains the pay rate for subsequent pay periods at the 2013 rate. Reduces the annual rate of pay of the President from $400,000 to $360,000.
Title
Savings Start With Us Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy. |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB270 (Related) 2011-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
HB335 (Related) 2011-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy .
HB335 (Related) 2011-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy .
Subjects
Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress
Presidents and presidential powers
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress
Presidents and presidential powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1012/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1012/BILLS-112hr1012ih.pdf |