US HB1016 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 387.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 387.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assessing Progress in Haiti Act - Directs the President to report to Congress on the status of post-earthquake humanitarian, reconstruction, and development efforts in Haiti, including efforts to prevent the spread of cholera and treat persons infected with the disease. Requires such report to evaluate: (1) the overall progress of relief, recovery, and reconstruction in Haiti, including U.S. government programs, programs to protect vulnerable populations, and projects to improve water, sanitation, and health; (2) the extent to which U.S. and international efforts are in line with the government of Haiti's priorities and are working through Haitian ministries and local authorities; (3) coordination among U.S. government agencies and coordination between the U.S. government and U.N. agencies, international financial institutions, and other bilateral donors; (4) mechanisms for communicating the progress of recovery and reconstruction to Haitian citizens; (5) mechanisms through which Haitian civil society and the Haitian diaspora are participating in recovery and reconstruction; and (6) Haiti's suitability to receive aliens who are removed, excluded, or deported from the United States and steps Haiti is taking to strengthen its capacity in this regard.
Title
Assessing Progress in Haiti Act
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] |
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 387. |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment. Without written report. |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2011-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-05-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3127) |
2011-05-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1016. |
2011-05-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3126-3131) |
2011-05-10 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-04-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2011-04-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-03-31 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere. |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1576 (Related) 2011-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Foreign aid and international relief
Haiti
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
Natural disasters
Reconstruction and stabilization
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
United Nations
World health
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Foreign aid and international relief
Haiti
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
Natural disasters
Reconstruction and stabilization
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
United Nations
World health