US HB1026 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 443.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 443.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
North Country National Scenic Trail Route Adjustment Act This bill amends the National Trails System Act to revise the authorized route of the North Country National Scenic Trail to extend it to the Appalachian Trail in Vermont and to modify the route in northeastern Minnesota. The Departments of Agriculture and the Interior may not acquire for the trail land in Minnesota or Vermont that was obtained by a state or local government through condemnation.
Title
North Country National Scenic Trail Route Adjustment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Jason Lewis [R-MN] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 443. |
2018-06-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4748) |
2018-06-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1026. |
2018-06-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4748-4750) |
2018-06-05 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 512. |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-667. |
2018-04-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-18 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB363 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 129.