US HB1029 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Loopholes in Social Security Taxes Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to apply employment and self-employment taxes to remuneration up to the contribution and benefit base and to remuneration in excess of $250,000.
Title
No Loopholes in Social Security Taxes Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. John Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. William Enyart [D-IL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB500 (Related) 2013-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2382 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5306 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5852 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2382 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5306 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5852 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1029/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1029/BILLS-113hr1029ih.pdf |