US HB1046 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concrete Masonry Products Research, Education, and Promotion Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Commerce to issue orders applicable to U.S. manufacturers of concrete masonry products. Any such order must provide for the establishment of a Concrete Masonry Products Board to carry out a program of generic promotion, research, and education regarding concrete masonry products. An order must also provide that assessments be paid by concrete masonry product manufacturers for concrete masonry products manufactured and marketed in the United States. At least 50% of the assessments paid by a manufacturer must be used to support research, education, and generic promotion programs and projects in support of the geographic region of the manufacturer. During the 60-day period preceding the proposed effective date of an order, Commerce shall conduct a referendum for order approval among manufacturers. The bill allows petition and review of an order, and order enforcement through U.S. district courts. The bill requires a study and a report by: (1) the Government Accountability Office on how the board spends assessments collected, the impact of board activities, and other matters relating to the demand for concrete masonry products; and (2) Commerce on the appropriateness and effectiveness of applying the commodity check-off program model to a nonagricultural industry.
Title
Concrete Masonry Products Research, Education, and Promotion Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection. |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB374 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 365.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Building construction
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Judicial review and appeals
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Materials
User charges and fees
Administrative remedies
Building construction
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Judicial review and appeals
Manufacturing
Marketing and advertising
Materials
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1046/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1046/BILLS-115hr1046ih.pdf |