US HB1059 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-03 - Became Public Law No: 112-84.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-03 - Became Public Law No: 112-84.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on November 15, 2011. The summary of that version is repeated here.) Revises the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to extend until December 31, 2017, the Judicial Conference's authority to redact financial disclosure reports filed by a judicial officer or employee if it finds that revealing personal and sensitive information could endanger that individual or a family member of that individual.
Title
To protect the safety of judges by extending the authority of the Judicial Conference to redact sensitive information contained in their financial disclosure reports, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-12 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 384 N: 0 NV: 47 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-03 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-84. |
2012-01-03 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2011-12-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2011-12-20 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-12-20 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/19/2011 H9937-9938) |
2011-12-20 | Senate | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9999) |
2011-12-19 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Smith (TX) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. |
2011-12-19 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on agreeing to the Senate amendment to H.R. 1059. |
2011-12-19 | Senate | Mr. Smith (TX) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9937-9938) |
2011-11-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-11-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7776-7777; text as passed Senate: CR S7777) |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 232. |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with an amendment. Without written report. |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2011-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2011-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 0 (Roll no. 701). (text: CR H6048) |
2011-09-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6052) |
2011-09-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1059. |
2011-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6048-6049) |
2011-09-12 | House | Mr. Coble moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-07-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 123. |
2011-07-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-189. |
2011-07-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2011-07-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law. |
2011-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2011-03-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E475) |
Subjects
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Judges
Law
Right of privacy
Government information and archives
Judges
Law
Right of privacy