US HB1065 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 209-20)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To eliminate discrimination and promote women's health and economic security by ensuring reasonable workplace accommodations for workers whose ability to perform the functions of a job are limited by pregnancy, childbirth, or a related medical condition.
Title
Pregnant Workers Fairness Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - On passage (Y: 315 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2021-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-05-14 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 315 - 101 (Roll no. 143). |
2021-05-14 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-05-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1065. |
2021-05-14 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2547 and H.R. 1065. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. The previous question on each measure is considered ordered without intervening motions except one hour of debate and a motion to recommit. H. Res. 379 is adopted. |
2021-05-14 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 380. (consideration: CR H2321-2343) |
2021-05-12 | House | Rule H. Res. 380 passed House. |
2021-05-11 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 380 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2547 and H.R. 1065. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. The previous question on each measure is considered ordered without intervening motions except one hour of debate and a motion to recommit. H. Res. 379 is adopted. |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 14. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-27, Part I. |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 17. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR380 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1486 (Same As) 2021-09-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 141.
SB4431 (Related) 2022-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 425.
SB1486 (Same As) 2021-09-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 141.
SB4431 (Related) 2022-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 425.