US HB1067 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Mineral Leasing Act to clarify the effect of a pending civil action on the processing of an application for a permit to drill, to require courts to remand lease sale Environmental Impact Statements to agencies to remedy when necessary, and to establish a term limit for permits to drill.
Title
American Energy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] | Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] | Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Eric Burlison [R-MO] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] |
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] |
Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
HB1335 (Related) 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 18.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB1335 (Related) 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 18.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1067/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1067/BILLS-118hr1067ih.pdf |