US HB1120 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Marijuana Revenue and Regulation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana Revenue and Regulation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB420 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB420 (Related) 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback