US HB1126 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dwight D. Eisenhower Memorial Completion Act - Provides for the appointment of members of the Dwight D. Eisenhower Memorial Commission to a four-year term. Ensures that a design is selected by the Commission for the Dwight D. Eisenhower Memorial as an alternative to any designs submitted or selected before this Act's enactment. Prohibits the use of federal funds to establish the Memorial.
Title
Dwight D. Eisenhower Memorial Completion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Kerry Bentivolio [R-MI] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-06-12 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-03-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5203 (Related) 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 536.
Subjects
Government operations and politics
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Presidential administrations
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Presidential administrations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1126/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1126/BILLS-113hr1126ih.pdf |